EP2342705 - COLLISION RECORDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/28] | SYSTEM FOR RECORDING COLLISIONS | ||
[2017/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLANKENHORN, Horst Breisacher Str. 10 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
REITMEIER, Willibald Forstbergring 9 93155 Hohenschambach / DE | 03 /
SCHÄDLICH, Denny Oelsnitzer Str. 70 08223 Neustadt / DE | [2011/28] | Application number, filing date | 09783169.7 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009EP62111 | Priority number, date | DE20081048163 | 19.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008048163 | [2011/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031836 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342705 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2342705 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G07C5/08, G01S15/93 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
G08G1/16 (EP,US);
G01S15/931 (EP,US);
G07C5/085 (EP,US);
G07C5/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2011/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR KOLLISIONSAUFZEICHNUNG | [2011/28] | English: | COLLISION RECORDING SYSTEM | [2017/14] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENREGISTREMENT DE COLLISION | [2017/14] |
Former [2011/28] | SYSTEM FOR RECORDING COLLISIONS | ||
Former [2011/28] | SYSTÈME D'ENREGISTREMENT DE COLLISIONS | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 11.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | AT | 18.09.2017 | IE | 18.09.2017 | LU | 18.09.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | GB | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | FR | 02.10.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
AT | 18.09.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
AT | 18.09.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
AT | 18.09.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
AT | 18.09.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
AT | 18.09.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2268608 (NORM PACIFIC AUTOMAT CORP [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 1, lines 2-4 * * page 2, lines 15-21 * * page 6, lines 7-18 * * page 7, lines 3-21 * * page 9, lines 1-17 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 14 * * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19712522 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-21,37-62 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, lines 30-50 * * column 6, lines 19-36 * * column 9, lines 6-24 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0118491 (KIM GUI JU [KR]) [A] 1,3-5,7,10,12-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-11 * * page 2, lines 1-15 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 19 * * page 8, lines 6-14 * * page 9, lines 3-17 * * page 16, line 20 - page 17, line 4 * * claims 1,2,6,7,13 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE10106181 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 7,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0010] , [0012] , [0013] , [0017] , [0020] , [0024] * * claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]DE10223123 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3-5,7,10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [0007] - [0012] , [0013] , [0015] , [0017] * * claims 1-3,6,8 ** figure 1 * |