EP2346824 - NOVEL ESTROGEN RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KARO BIO AB Novum 141 57 Huddinge / SE | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHÖNNSTAD, Patrik c/o Karo Bio AB Novum S-141 57 Huddinge / SE | 02 /
APELQVIST, Theresa c/o Karo Bio AB Novum S-141 57 Huddinge / SE | 03 /
WENNERSTAL, Mattias c/o Karo Bio AB Novum S-141 57 Huddinge / SE | 04 /
CHENG, Aiping c/o Karo Bio AB Novum S-141 57 Huddinge / SE | 05 /
GORDON, Sandra c/o Karo Bio AB Novum S-141 57 Huddinge / SE | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09783199.4 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009EP62144 | Priority number, date | GB20080017221 | 19.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0817221 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031852 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2346824 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/14, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, C07D407/04, C07D409/04, C07D413/04, A61K31/404, A61K31/4155, A61K31/4178, A61K31/422, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61P19/02, A61P15/12, A61P9/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D209/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | NEUE LIGANDEN FÜR DEN ÖSTROGENREZEPTOR | [2011/30] | English: | NOVEL ESTROGEN RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2011/30] | French: | NOUVEAUX LIGANDS DE RÉCEPTEURS DES STROGÈNES | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 20.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2707268 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-22 * Since the document has two page numberings, the one on top of the page has been used.; page 13, paragraphs LAST,PARAGRAPH; examples 2,4,15-17,19-21,36,38 *; | [Y]WO2005018636 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MEWSHAW ET AL, "ERbeta ligands. Part 5: Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of a series of 4'-hydroxyphenyl-aryl-carbaldehyde oxime derivatives", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20070201), vol. 17, no. 4, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 902 - 906, XP005868806 [Y] 1-22 * table 1; compounds 50, 51, 52 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2006.11.066 | [Y] - MILLER, C.P.; HARRIS, H.A.; KOMM, B.S.;, "Bazedoxifene Acetate", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (2002), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 117 - 121, XP002557325 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2002.027.02.637843 | [A] - KAUFMANN ET AL, "Antimitotic activities of 2-phenylindole-3-carbaldehydes in human breast cancer cells", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (20070608), vol. 15, no. 15, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 5122 - 5136, XP022110115 [A] 1-22 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2007.05.030 |