24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
25.07.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
13.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
16.08.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.05.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
10.10.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2012 |
First examination report |
|
30.12.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
15.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|