Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8726754 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2014 | B2 | US2011197694 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP62595 | 29.09.2009 | DE102008043107 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2337975 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2013 | B1 | EP2337975 | 29.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP62595 | 29.09.2009 | DE102008043107 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102187128B | 25.06.2014 | B | CN102187128 | 14.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP62595 | 29.09.2009 | DE102008043107 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010046206 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008043107 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008043107 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008043107 | 23.10.2008 |