Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110045077 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 | WO2009EP62744 | 01.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012504670 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 | WO2009EP62744 | 01.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2328939 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2012 | B1 | EP2328939 | 08.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 | EP09783634 | 01.10.2009 | WO2009EP62744 | 01.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0919131 | 08.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 | WO2009EP62744 | 01.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102171253B | 10.07.2013 | B | CN102171253 | 31.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 | WO2009EP62744 | 01.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA019145 | 30.01.2014 | B1 | EA201170391 | 30.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 | WO2009EP62744 | 01.10.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010037808 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2172493 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08290933 | 02.10.2008 |