EP2482793 - USE OF PIPERIDINE ESTER DERIVATIVE AS SOLVENT IN COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS; COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, Benoit 168 quai de Jemmapes F-75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
RICHARD, Hervé 1ter Sentier des Petits Clos F-93320 Gagny / FR | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2012/32] | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 09783684.5 | 02.10.2009 | WO2009EP62817 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011038776 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2482793 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2482793 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61Q17/04, A61K8/35, A61K8/368, A61K8/41, A61K8/46 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (US);
A61K8/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES PIPERIDINESTERDERIVATS ALS LÖSUNGSMITTEL FÜR KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | [2012/32] | English: | USE OF PIPERIDINE ESTER DERIVATIVE AS SOLVENT IN COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS; COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IT | [2012/32] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN DÉRIVÉ D'ESTER DE PIPÉRIDINE EN TANT QUE SOLVANT DANS DES COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 03.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2009 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MK | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | SM | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | IE | 02.10.2015 | LU | 02.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.10.2015 | ||
LU | 02.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.10.2015 | ||
LU | 02.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003235539 (MONGIAT SEBASTIEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] - [0011] - [0023] *; | [A]WO2004058259 (BIOFOCUS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 25, line 20 *; | [XA]WO2004092123 (MICROBIA INC [US], et al) [X] 8 * compound L 7, p. 12 of Fig. 1A * * page 55, line 28 * * page 57, lines 15-16 * [A] 1-7,9-15; | [A]US2007141014 (PFLUCKER FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0010] , [0133] - [0154] - [0217] - [0230] * * examples 11, 12, 13 * | by applicant | FR853107 |