EP2338225 - ENERGY RECOVERY DEVICE IN A VARIABLE-FREQUENCY DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Toshiba Inverter Europe SAS 33, rue André Blanchet 27120 Pacy sur Eure / FR | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRBOVIC, Petar c/o Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Proprieté Industrielle 35, rue Joseph Monier - CS30323 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | 02 /
BAUDESSON, Philippe 4 Route l'Essart Clément F-27220 La Boissiere / FR | 03 /
LE MOIGNE, Philippe 50 rue Henri Derain F-59310 Nomain / FR | [2014/49] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
GRBOVIC, Petar c/o Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Proprieté Industrielle 35, rue Joseph Monier - CS30323 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
BAUDESSON, Philippe 4 Route l'Essart Clément F-27220 La Boissiere / FR | |||
03 /
LE MOIGNE, Philippe 50 rue Henri Derain F-59310 Nomain / FR | |||
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
GRBOVIC, Petar 20 rue Dr Devignevielle Apt. 6 F-27200 Vernon / FR | ||
02 /
BAUDESSON, Philippe 4 Route l'Essart Clément F-27220 La Boissiere / FR | |||
03 /
LE MOIGNE, Philippe 50 rue Henri Derain F-59310 Nomain / FR | Representative(s) | Dufresne, Thierry, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2014/49] |
Former [2011/26] | Dufresne, Thierry, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09783950.0 | 12.10.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009EP63275 | Priority number, date | FR20080057141 | 21.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0857141 | [2011/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010046262 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338225 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338225 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02P27/06, H02M3/07 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
H02P27/06 (EP,US);
H02P2201/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEWIEDERGEWINNUNGSEINRICHTUNG IN EINEM ANTRIEB MIT VARIABLER FREQUENZ | [2011/26] | English: | ENERGY RECOVERY DEVICE IN A VARIABLE-FREQUENCY DRIVE | [2011/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECUPERATION D'ENERGIE DANS UN VARIATEUR DE VITESSE | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 31.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2009 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | ES | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | HR | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | MK | 03.12.2014 | MT | 03.12.2014 | NL | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | SM | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | NO | 03.03.2015 | GR | 04.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 12.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
MT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
SM | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
HR | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 03.12.2014 | |
NO | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001017234 (SUGA IKURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 34 - paragraph 40 *; | [A]EP1641110 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, paragraph 37 - page 5, paragraph 43; figure 3 *; | [A]US2006267527 (KHOPKAR RAHUL V [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |