Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8840061 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2014 | B2 | US2011174919 | 21.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | WO2009FR00981 | 05.08.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2342128 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | B1 | EP2342128 | 13.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | WO2009FR00981 | 05.08.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0919451 | 15.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | WO2009FR00981 | 05.08.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2735951 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | WO2009FR00981 | 05.08.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102171100 | 31.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | WO2009FR00981 | 05.08.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2502529T | 03.10.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | WO2009FR00981 | 05.08.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2936493 | 02.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2500584 | 10.12.2013 | C2 | RU2011116968 | 10.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | WO2009FR00981 | 05.08.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010037917 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2936494 | 27.05.2011 | B1 | FR2936494 | 02.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0901071 | 09.03.2009 | FR0805420 | 01.10.2008 |