EP2313376 - SUBSTITUTED 1-BENZYL-CINNOLIN-4(1H)-ONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION THEREOF, AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/52] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states SANOFI 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBAGALLO, Elodie c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
RINALDI-CARMONA, Murielle c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
ROUX, Pascale c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
VERNHET, Claude c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | [2014/52] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
BARBAGALLO, Elodie c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
RINALDI-CARMONA, Murielle c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
ROUX, Pascale c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
VERNHET, Claude c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Werner, Alain Henri Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/52] |
Former [2011/17] | Werner, Alain Henri Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09784493.0 | 09.07.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009FR51362 | Priority number, date | FR20080003974 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: FR 0803974 | [2011/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010004215 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2313376 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313376 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/28, C07D405/04, C07D409/04, A61K31/502, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, C07D237/36 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C07D237/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/502 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Extension states | AL | 11.02.2011 | BA | 11.02.2011 | RS | 11.02.2011 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 1-BENZYLCINNOLIN-4(1H)-ON DERIVATE, ZUBEREITUNG DAVON UND THERAPEUTISCHE ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/32] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 1-BENZYL-CINNOLIN-4(1H)-ONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION THEREOF, AND THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF | [2011/17] | French: | DERIVES DE 1-BENZYL-CINNOLIN-4-(1H)-ONE SUBSTITUES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION EN THERAPEUTIQUE | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/17] | SUBSTITUIERTE 1-BENZYLCINNOLIN-4(1H)-ONDERIVATE, ZUBEREITUNG DAVON UND THERAPEUTISCHE ANWENDUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2009 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | DK | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | HR | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | MK | 24.12.2014 | MT | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | PT | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | SM | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | NO | 24.03.2015 | GR | 25.03.2015 | IS | 24.04.2015 | IE | 09.07.2015 | LU | 09.07.2015 | BE | 31.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.07.2009 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.07.2015 | ||
LU | 09.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 09.07.2009 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.07.2015 | ||
LU | 09.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.07.2015 | ||
LU | 09.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.07.2015 | ||
LU | 09.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 09.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 09.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 24.12.2014 | |
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0242269 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [AD] - E. STERN ET AL., "Pharmacomodulations around the 4-oxo-1,4-dihydroquinoline-3-carboxamides, a class of potent CB2-selective cannabinoid receptor ligands: consequences in receptor affinity and functionality.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 50, pages 5471 - 5484, XP002515712 [AD] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM070387H |