EP2321688 - OBJECTIVE LENS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ernst Leitz Wetzlar GmbH Am Leitz-Park 2 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states CW Sonderoptic GmbH Am Leitz-Park 1 35578 Wetzlar / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states ACM Projektenwicklung GmbH Gaisbergstrasse 6 5020 Salzburg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEIL, Ian, A. Via Miravalle 25A 6900 Massagno / CH | [2019/43] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
NEIL, Ian, A. Via Miravalle 25A CH-6900 Massagno / CH | Representative(s) | Stamer, Jan Jahnstraße 9 35579 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Köllner, Malte, et al Köllner & Partner Patentanwälte Vogelweidstrasse 8 60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785005.1 | 25.08.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009GB02070 | Priority number, date | US20080197526 | 25.08.2008 Original published format: US 197526 | US20080200487 | 28.08.2008 Original published format: US 200487 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010023441 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321688 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2321688 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/18, G02B9/64 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
G02B13/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | G02B13/00, G02B9/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2011/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OBJEKTIVLINSENSYSTEM | [2011/20] | English: | OBJECTIVE LENS SYSTEM | [2011/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LENTILLE D'OBJECTIF | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 09.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2009 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | IE | 25.08.2020 | LU | 25.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.08.2009 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0893725 (PANAVISION INC [US]) [Y] 23-25 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2001033703 (CANON KK) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [XY]EP1734393 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-22,26,27 * paragraph [0054]; figure 1; claims 1,4; table 1 * [Y] 23-25 | Examination | US2004017605 | US7123421 | US2006262418 | by applicant | US7123421 | EP1734393 |