Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011146939 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0810982 | 16.06.2008 | WO2009GB50683 | 16.06.2009 | GB0921857 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2339281 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0921857 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2313710 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0810982 | 16.06.2008 | WO2009GB50683 | 16.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0921857D0 | 27.01.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0921857 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010004302 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0810982 | 16.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0810982D0 | 23.07.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0810982 | 16.06.2008 |