EP2307919 - OPTICAL COMPONENT ORGANISER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Raychem BVBA Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASTMANS, Kristof Willebringestraat 14 B-3370 Boutersem / BE | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Leppard, Andrew John, et al Bryer, Shelley, John Amor Greenwood LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Leppard, Andrew John, et al Bryer, Shelley, John Amor, Greenwood LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785265.1 | 29.06.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009GB50751 | Priority number, date | GB20080012271 | 04.07.2008 Original published format: GB 0812271 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010015846 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2307919 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/4441 (EP,US);
G02B6/4477 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | ORGANISIERER OPTISCHER KOMPONENTEN | [2011/15] | English: | OPTICAL COMPONENT ORGANISER | [2011/15] | French: | PLATINE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE COMPOSANT OPTIQUE | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 05.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5956449 (OTANI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO03098306 (TYCO ELECTRONICS RAYCHEM NV [BE], et al); | [XYI]US2006147171 (DOFHER DARREN [CA]); | [XI]WO2007050515 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US], et al) | Examination | WO9848308 | by applicant | US5956449 | US2006147171 | WO2007050515 |