EP2318803 - OPTICAL PROXIMITY FUZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MBDA UK Limited Six Hills Way Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states MBDA UK Limited Six Hills Way Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2DA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENNINGS, Martyn, Robert MBDA UK Limited Bldg 20W FPC W21 Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB | 02 /
MILLER, Lee, Douglas MBDA UK Limited Blgd 20W FPC W21 Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
JENNINGS, Martyn, Robert MBDA UK Limited Bldg 20W FPC W21 Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB | ||
02 /
MILLER, Lee, Douglas MBDA UK Limited Blgd 20W FPC W21 Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB | Representative(s) | McBrien, Matthew Nicholas BAE Systems plc Group IP Department Warwick House, P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre GB-Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/19] | McBrien, Matthew Nicholas BAE Systems plc Group IP Department Warwick House, P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre GB-Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785455.8 | 06.08.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009GB50985 | Priority number, date | GB20080014503 | 08.08.2008 Original published format: GB 0814503 | EP20090275015 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09275015 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010015860 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2318803 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2318803 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F42C13/02, G01S7/481 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
G01S7/4818 (EP,US);
F42C13/02 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | F42C13/02, G01S7/481, G01S17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER ANNÄHERUNGSZÜNDER | [2011/19] | English: | OPTICAL PROXIMITY FUZE | [2011/19] | French: | FUSÉE OPTIQUE DE PROXIMITÉ | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 12.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2009 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | SM | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3219082 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [X] 1-8,10,14,16-17 * abstract * * page 3 - page 5 *; | [A]US4903602 (SKAGERLUND LARS-ERIK [SE]) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 11 * * column 2, line 44 - line 48 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 18 *; | [XY]US5014621 (FOX THOMAS M [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,11,13-14,16-17 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 39 * [Y] 12; | [A]US5291261 (DAHL RANDY [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * abstract ** column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 21 *; | [A]US2003016348 (SALLEE BRADLEY [US]) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * sentence 22, paragraph 21 * * paragraph [0035] *; | [YD]US2003179367 (JENNINGS MARTYN R [GB], et al) [YD] 12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3219082 | US5014621 | WO0229436 |