EP2315764 - CRYSTALLINE FORM OF SUNITINIB AND PROCESSES FOR ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Generics [UK] Limited Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORE, Vinayak c/o Mylan Development Centre Private Limited Plot 1 A/2 M.I.D.C. Industrial Estate Taloja Panvel District Raigad Maharashtra 410208 / IN | 02 /
CHOUDHARI, Bharati c/o Mylan Development Centre Private Limited Plot 1 A/2 M.I.D.C. Industrial Estate Taloja Panvel District Raigad Maharashtra 410208 / IN | 03 /
HUBLIKAR, Mahesh c/o Mylan Development Centre Private Limited Plot 1 A/2 M.I.D.C. Industrial Estate Taloja Panvel District Raigad Maharashtra 410208 / IN | 04 /
BANSODE, Prakash c/o Mylan Development Centre Private Limited Plot 1 A/2 M.I.D.C. Industrial Estate Taloja Panvel District Raigad Maharashtra 410208 / IN | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/18] | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785519.1 | 24.08.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009GB51054 | Priority number, date | IN2008KOL1434 | 25.08.2008 Original published format: IN KO14342008 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010023473 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2315764 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, A61K31/404, A61P35/00 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE FORM VON SUNITINIB UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2011/18] | English: | CRYSTALLINE FORM OF SUNITINIB AND PROCESSES FOR ITS PREPARATION | [2011/18] | French: | NOUVELLE FORME CRISTALLINE ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO0160814 (SUGEN INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-9,15,19,21-25,29,30,32,33,35,37,39,40 * example 80; claims 1,54,57 * [Y] 10-14,16-18,20,31,34,36,38; | [DXY]WO03016305 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [DX] 26-29,32 * example 1; claims 1,2,21,22 * * page 3, line 1 - line 16 * [Y] 10-14,16-18,20,30,31,33-40; | [PX]WO2009067674 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [PX] 1-6,26,29,30,32,33,35,37,39,40 * figures 1,3; example 1; claims 1,25 * * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 21 * * page 29, line 25 - line 33 *; | [PX]WO2009074862 (MEDICHEM SA [ES], et al) [PX] 1-12,15-17,19-26,29-40 * figure 7; examples 14,24; claims 1,13; table 2 * * comparative example 1 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] *; | [E]WO2009128083 (NATCO PHARMA LTD [IN], et al) [E] 1-6,29-40 * figures 1,3; example 1; claims 1,3 * * page 1, line 9 - line 19 * * page 9, line 4 - line 17 *; | [E]EP2098521 (RATIOPHARM GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-6,29-40 * figures 1,4; claims 1-4,13 * * paragraph [0002] *; | [E]WO2009157011 (NATCO PHARMA LTD [IN], et al) [E] 26,27,29-40 * examples 1(vii,viii); claim 1 * * page 1, line 4 - line 14 *; | [E]WO2010004339 (GENERICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [E] 26-40 * example 1; claims 1,6,65-72 * | [Y] - ATKINS M ET AL, "Sunitinib maleate", NATURE REVIEWS. DRUG DISCOVERY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, BASINGSTOKE, GB, (200604), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1474-1784, pages 279 - 280, XP002481456 [Y] 30,31,33-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd2012 |