EP2332012 - ENERGY ACTIVATED COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datalase Limited Unit 3, Wheldon Road Widnes, Cheshire WA8 8FW / GB | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states DataLase Ltd Unit 3, Wheldon Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 8FW / GB | ||
For all designated states Jarvis, Anthony DataLase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes, Cheshire WA8 8FW / GB | |||
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states DataLase Ltd Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes WA8 8FW / GB | ||
For all designated states Jarvis, Anthony DataLase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes, Cheshire WA8 8FW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARVIS, Anthony DataLase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 8FW / GB | [2014/28] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
JARVIS, Anthony DataLase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 8FW / GB | Representative(s) | Creek, Isobel Clare Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2014/28] |
Former [2011/24] | Creek, Isobel Clare Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785526.6 | 26.08.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009GB51061 | Priority number, date | GB20080016543 | 10.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0816543 | GB20090005785 | 02.04.2009 Original published format: GB 0905785 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029329 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2332012 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2332012 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/73, G03F7/00, G03F7/025, B41M5/28 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
G03C1/73 (EP,US);
B41M5/26 (EP,US);
B41M5/267 (EP,US);
B41M5/28 (EP,US);
B41M5/282 (EP,US);
B41M5/283 (EP,US);
B41M5/284 (EP,US);
B41M5/285 (EP,US);
G03F7/105 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G03C1/73, G03C2200/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEAKTIVIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2011/24] | English: | ENERGY ACTIVATED COMPOSITIONS | [2011/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ACTIVÉES PAR UNE ÉNERGIE | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.02.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2009 | AT | 09.07.2014 | BE | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | CZ | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | HR | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | MK | 09.07.2014 | MT | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | PL | 09.07.2014 | RO | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SI | 09.07.2014 | SK | 09.07.2014 | SM | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | IE | 26.08.2014 | LU | 26.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | NO | 09.10.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | IS | 09.11.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.08.2014 | ||
LU | 26.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 26.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2006063045 ; | [X]US5095134 (LIU KOU-CHANG [US]) [X] 1-17 * column 2, line 10 - line 17 * * column 3, line 47 - line 57 * * column 5, line 45 - line 46; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9207298 (ISP INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 9, line 24 - line 32 * * page 16, line 1 - line 4; claims 5,6 *; | [X]US2003103905 (RIBI HANS O [US]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0023] - [0028]; claims 1,2 *; | [DX]WO2006018640 (SHERWOOD TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-17 * page 2, line 27 - line 30 * * page 4, line 13 - line 24 * * page 5, line 12 - line 13 * * page 6, line 21 - line 25 * * page 7, line 16 - line 18 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 22, Database accession no. 2006-207542, XP002554424 & JP2006063045 A 20060309 (DOKURITSU GYOSEI HOJIN SANGYO GIJUTSU SO) [X] 1-17 * abstract * |