EP2337948 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INSTALLING TIDAL BARRAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VerdErg Limited 6 Old London Road Kingston upon Thames Surrey KT2 6QF / GB | [2015/28] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Verderg Ltd Lansbury Estate, Unit 5&6 102 Lower Guildford Road Knaphill Surrey GU21 2EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Peter Miles 2 Wildgoose Drive Horsham Surrey RH12 ITU / GB | [2015/44] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
ROBERTS, Peter Miles 2 Wildgoose Drive Horsham Surrey RH12 ITU / GB | Representative(s) | Atkins, James Gordon John Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Callaghan, Dayle Anne, et al Rouse IP Limited 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | ||
Former [2014/24] | Callaghan, Dayle Anne, et al Rouse IP Limited 11th Floor Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Andrews, Martyn Peter Rouse Patents 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 09785563.9 | 02.09.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009GB51104 | Priority number, date | GB20080016942 | 16.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0816942 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010032026 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2337948 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337948 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/26, E02B9/08 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
E02B9/08 (EP,GB,US);
F03B13/264 (EP,GB,US);
F05B2230/60 (EP,US);
F05B2240/40 (EP,US);
Y02A20/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INSTALLATION VON GEZEITENDÄMMEN | [2011/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INSTALLING TIDAL BARRAGES | [2011/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR INSTALLER DES BARRAGES MARÉMOTEURS | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/26] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR INSTALLER DES BARRAGES DE MARÉES | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 30.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2009 | AT | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | IT | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | SM | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 02.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | IT | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | IT | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 28.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [IA]FR923131 ; | [IA]FR2470195 (HAMMOND THOMAS [GB]); | [IA]DE3813958 (PAGEL UWE DIPL ING [DE], et al); | [A]FR2792661 (AVIAS JACQUES VICTORIN ARMAND [FR]); | [IA]WO2005017349 (TIDETEC AS [NO], et al); | [IA]US2005285407 (DAVIS BARRY V [CA], et al); | [A]WO2006055393 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al); | [IA]WO2008015047 (VERDERG ENGINEERING LTD [GB], et al) |