EP2389301 - MULTI-PURPOSE TRAILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dsv A/s Banemarksvej 58 2605 Brondby / DK | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUND, Soeren Stolbjergvej 1 DK-3070 Snekkersten / DK | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Soeren Mikkelborg Allé 13 DK-2970 Hoersholm / DK | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Roerboel, Leif Budde Schou A/S Vester So̸gade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 09785790.8 | 26.01.2009 | WO2009IB00121 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010084368 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2389301 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/06 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B60J7/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEHRZWECKANHÄNGER | [2011/48] | English: | MULTI-PURPOSE TRAILER | [2011/48] | French: | REMORQUE À USAGES MULTIPLES | [2011/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 19.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/05] | 20.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0936093 (SHINOHARA TADAO [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, lines 40-46 * * column 8, lines 18-30 * * column 9, lines 7-14 * * figures 26-33 *; | [Y]US3486787 (CAMPBELL WHITTINGTON A) [Y] 1-16 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4419034 (DIMARTINO JOHN M [US]) [A] 1,11-15 * abstract * |