EP2323967 - FESOTERODINE COMPRISING A REDUCED AMOUNT OF DEHYDROXYFESOTERODINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actavis Group PTC EHF Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjorour / IS | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEELA, Praveen, Kumar H.no. 16-2-705/9/a/8 Professor's Colony Malakpet Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500036 / IN | 02 /
CHARUGUNDLA, Kishore House No: 7-43 S.p.l Road Opposite To Kalayana Mandapam Vissannapeta Post-521215 Kirshna District Andhra Pradesh / IN | 03 /
KUMAR, Udhaya No.15, Voc Street Shanmugapuram Pondicherry 605009 / IN | 04 /
PRADHAN, Nitin, Sharadchandra C-602, Runwal Estate Ghoad Bunder Road Opposite Lawkim Company Manpada Thane (West) Maharashtra 400601 / IN | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Blance, Stephen John, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Blance, Stephen John, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/27] | Mannion, Sally Kim, et al Avidity IP Ltd Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/21] | Lasterra Sánchez, Elena, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09786139.7 | 21.07.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009IB06546 | Priority number, date | INCH17422008 | 21.07.2008 Original published format: IN CH17422008 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010010464 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2323967 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/41, C07C57/15, C07C59/50, C07C213/06, C07C213/10, C07C219/28, A61K31/216, A61P13/00 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
C07C57/15 (EP,US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C213/00 (EP,US);
C07C219/28 (EP,US);
C07C51/412 (EP,US);
C07C55/06 (EP,US);
C07C55/10 (EP,US);
C07C57/145 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C213/00, C07C217/62 (US,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C57/15 (US,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C59/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | FESOTERODIN, DAS EINE REDUZIERTE MENGE AN DEHYDROXYFESOTERODIN ENTHÄLT | [2011/21] | English: | FESOTERODINE COMPRISING A REDUCED AMOUNT OF DEHYDROXYFESOTERODINE | [2011/21] | French: | FESOTERODINE COMPORTANT UNE QUANTITE REDUITE DE DEHYDROXYFESOTERODINE | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 09.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 26.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE19955190 (SANOL ARZNEI SCHWARZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 4-9,43,76-82 * page 10, line 40 - page 13, line 46 * [I] 10-42,54-75,83-88; | [XY]US2003158176 (RICHARDS IVAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * examples 13,14 * [Y] 44-53; | [YD]US6713464 (MEESE CLAUS [DE], et al) [YD] 44-53 * column 38, lines 1-20 * * column 39, lines 12-29 *; | [XY]US2004209916 (RICHARDS IVAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * examples 13,14 * [Y] 44-53; | [X]WO2006066509 (LI YOUXIN [CN]) [X] 1-3 * formula (I);;; table 1 *; | [XI]WO2007140986 (SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD [IE], et al) [X] 4-9,76-82 * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 13; claims 1,14,17-18 * * page 14, line 25 - line 27 * [I] 38-42,54-75,83-88; | [XPI]WO2009044278 (ACTAVIS GROUP PTC EHF [IS], et al) [XP] 54-59,83-88 * example 2; claims 2,28-33 *[I] 60-75; | [ ] - LI ET AL, "Injectable sustained release microspheric preparation of 3,3-diphenylpropylamine derivatives as muscarinic receptor antagonists", CAPLUS,, (20060629), URL: CAPLUS PAN - 2006-630212 ORD - 2006-06-29, XP007915209 [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - "Dehydroxyfesoterodine", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, URL: CAPLUS PAN - 895137-81-2P, XP007915210 [ ] * abstract * |