EP2328594 - STROMAL STEM CELLS DERIVED FORM ADIPOSE TISSUE FOR USE IN TREATING SIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/23] | USES OF MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS | ||
[2015/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TiGenix, S.A.U. Parque Tecnologico de Madrid C/ Marconi, 1 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Universidad de Sevilla Pabellón de Brasil Paseo de las Delicias s/n 41013 Sevilla / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states TiGenix, S.A.U. Parque Tecnologico de Madrid C/ Marconi, 1 28760 Tres Cantos - Madrid / ES | ||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Universidad de Sevilla Pabellón de Brasil Paseo de las Delicias s/n 41013 Sevilla / ES | |||
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Cellerix SA Calle Marconi 1 Parque Technologico de Madrid 28760 Tres Cantos, Madrid / ES | ||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELGADO, Mario Instituto De Parasitología Y Biomedicina "López-Neyra" CSIC Avda. Conocimiento S/N Parque Tecnologico, Ciencias de la Salud 18100 Armilla (Granada) / ES | 02 /
GONZALEZ-REY, Elena School of Medicine University of Seville Seville / ES | 03 /
BÜSCHER, Dirk Parque Tecnológico de Madrid Calle Marconi 1 28760 Tres Cantos Madrid / ES | [2016/11] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
DELGADO, Mario Instituto De Parasitología Y Biomedicina "López-Neyra" CSIC Avda. Conocimiento S/N Parque Tecnologico Ciencias de la Salud 18100 Armilla (Granada) / ES | ||
02 /
GONZALEZ-REY, Elena School of Medicine University of Seville Seville / ES | |||
03 /
BÜSCHER, Dirk Parque Tecnológico de Madrid Calle Marconi 1 28760 Tres Cantos Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/11] |
Former [2011/23] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09786159.5 | 03.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009IB06597 | Priority number, date | GB20080014249 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: GB 0814249 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010015929 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2328594 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328594 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/28, A61P29/00 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
A61K35/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2011/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMALE STAMMZELLEN GEWONNEN AUS FETTGEWEBE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON SIRS | [2015/40] | English: | STROMAL STEM CELLS DERIVED FORM ADIPOSE TISSUE FOR USE IN TREATING SIRS | [2015/40] | French: | CSM DÉRIVÉE DU TISSU ADIPEUX POUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT SRIS | [2015/40] |
Former [2011/23] | VERWENDUNGSZWECKE VON MESENCHYMSTAMMZELLEN | ||
Former [2011/23] | USES OF MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS | ||
Former [2011/23] | UTILISATIONS DE CELLULES SOUCHES MÉSENCHYMATEUSES | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16160083.8 / EP3095449 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | HR | 16.03.2016 | |
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | HR | 16.03.2016 | |
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | HR | 16.03.2016 | |
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 16.03.2016 | |
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2005093044 (OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,11,13-22,24-25,29-30 * page 2, column 2 * * page 3, column 1 * * page 4, columns 4,5 * * page 5, columns 1,4 * * page 6, column 5 - page 7, columns 1,5 * * page 9, column 3 * * page 10, columns 3,5 * * page 11, column 3 * * page 15, column 3 * [Y] 1-30 [I] 5-6,10,12,23,26-28; | [Y] - LE BLANC K ET AL, "Immunomodulation by mesenchymal stem cells and clinical experience.", JOURNAL OF INTERNAL MEDICINE NOV 2007, (200711), vol. 262, no. 5, ISSN 0954-6820, pages 509 - 525, XP002571510 [Y] 1-30 * page 509, column 4 * * page 510, column 3 * * page 511, columns 1,2 * * page 512, column 2 * * page 513, column 2 * * page 514, columns 6,7 * * page 515, columns 2,3 * * page 516, column 4 * * page 517, columns 2,3 * * page 519, columns 1,3-5 * * page 520, columns 2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-2796.2007.01844.X | [A] - WAGNER ET AL, "Comparative characteristics of mesenchymal stem cells from human bone marrow, adipose tissue, and umbilical cord blood", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20051101), vol. 33, no. 11, ISSN 0301-472X, pages 1402 - 1416, XP005136979 [A] 1-30 * page 1402, column 1 * * page 1403, columns 2,4 * * page 1405, column 5 * * page 1414, column 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exphem.2005.07.003 | [Y] - KIM JEONG-MIN ET AL, "Systemic transplantation of human adipose stem cells attenuated cerebral inflammation and degeneration in a hemorrhagic stroke model.", BRAIN RESEARCH 5 DEC 2007, (20071205), vol. 1183, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 43 - 50, XP002571511 [Y] 1-30 * page 44, columns 2,3,5 * * page 46, columns 5,6 * * page 47, columns 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BRAINRES.2007.09.005 | [Y] - XU JIANGUO ET AL, "Prevention of endotoxin-induced systemic response by bone marrow-derived mesenchymal stem cells in mice.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY. LUNG CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR PHYSIOLOGY JUL 2007, (200707), vol. 293, no. 1, ISSN 1040-0605, pages L131 - L141, XP002571512 [Y] 1-30 * page 131, columns 2,3 * * page 133, column 9 * * page 134, column 1 * * page 136, columns 4,5 * * page 140, columns 3-5 * * page 141, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajplung.00431.2006 | [A] - KAN I ET AL, "Integral therapeutic potential of bone marrow mesenchymal stem cells", CURRENT DRUG TARGETS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHER, US, (20050201), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 1389-4501, pages 31 - 41, XP002456405 [A] 1-30 * page 33, column 5 * * page 38, columns 5-8 * * page 39, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389450053344902 | by applicant | WO2005093044 | - NYSTROM, JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (1998), vol. 41, no. A, pages 1 - 7 | US20050065461 |