17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
12.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
17.02.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
11.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
19.02.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.02.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
02.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2011 |
First examination report |
|
17.11.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.09.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
05.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
08.04.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
01.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.11.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|