EP2318086 - ULTRASOUND MEDIATED DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/15] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, William PO Box 3003 Bothell Washington 98041-3003 / US | 02 /
CHIN, Chien, Ting P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US | 03 /
HALL, Christopher PO Box 3003 Bothell Washington 98041-3003 / US | 04 /
RAJU, Balasundara P.O. Box 3003 Bothell Washington 98041-3003 / US | 05 /
BOHMER, Marcel P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarbarough Road Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US | [2016/15] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
SHI, William PO Box 3003 Bothell Washington 98041-3003 / US | ||
02 /
CHIN, Chien, Ting P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US | |||
03 /
HALL, Christopher PO Box 3003 Bothell Washington 98041-3003 / US | |||
04 /
RAJU, Balasundara P.O. Box 3003 Bothell Washington 98041-3003 / US | |||
05 /
BOHMER, Marcel P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarbarough Road Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/15] |
Former [2011/19] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09786417.7 | 09.06.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009IB52449 | Priority number, date | US20080061690P | 23.07.2008 Original published format: US 61690 P | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010010473 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2318086 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2318086 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61M37/00, A61K41/00, A61K49/22 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
A61K41/0028 (EP,US);
A61K49/223 (EP,US);
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61M37/0092 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | A61M37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2011/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLVERMITTELTE WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG | [2011/19] | English: | ULTRASOUND MEDIATED DRUG DELIVERY | [2011/19] | French: | ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT INDUITE PAR LES ULTRASONS | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2009 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | IE | 09.06.2016 | LU | 09.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | GB | 13.07.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 09.06.2009 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 09.06.2016 | ||
LU | 09.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.06.2009 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 09.06.2016 | ||
LU | 09.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.06.2009 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 09.06.2016 | ||
LU | 09.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.06.2009 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 09.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 09.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GB | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO2006131840 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DX] 12-14 * abstract * * claims 5-8,30 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6135971 (HUTCHINSON ERIN [US], et al) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5618275 (BOCK ROBERT T [US]) [A] 12-14 * abstract * * figures 1-3B *; | [A]US6322532 (D SA JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 12-14 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * | Examination | WO2005070473 | by applicant | WO2005007043 | US2003204141 | WO2006131840 |