EP2427946 - PHOTOVOLTAIC UNITS, METHODS OF OPERATING PHOTOVOLTAIC UNITS AND CONTROLLERS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2012/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGVELD, Hendrik Johannes c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | 02 /
SCHOOFS, Franciscus c/o NXP Semiconductors IP Department Betchworth House57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | 03 /
HOOGZAAD, Gian c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09786562.0 | 10.07.2009 | WO2009IB53001 | Priority number, date | EP20090159824 | 08.05.2009 Original published format: EP 09159824 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010128363 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2427946 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/35, H01L31/02 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
H02J7/35 (EP,US);
H01L31/02021 (EP,US);
H02S40/32 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Title | German: | PHOTOVOLTAIKEINHEITEN, VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN VON PHOTOVOLTAIKEINHEITEN UND STEUERUNGEN DAFÜR | [2012/11] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC UNITS, METHODS OF OPERATING PHOTOVOLTAIC UNITS AND CONTROLLERS THEREFOR | [2012/11] | French: | UNITÉS PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES, PROCÉDÉS D'EXPLOITATION D'UNITÉS PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES ET RÉGULATEURS À CET EFFET | [2012/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 28.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10219956 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0033] , [0034] *; | [X]WO03098703 (ROEHRIG RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * figure 5 * * page 25 *; | [X]US2005139258 (LIU YUNG-HSIANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-21 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0011] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0023] , [0025] ** figure 1 * |