EP2459453 - CUTTING UNIT FOR LABELLING MACHINES WITH A MULTIPLE-BLADE ROTARY DRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel S.p.A. Via La Spezia 241/a 43126 Parma / IT | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARMICHAEL, James c/o SIDEL S.p.A. Via La Spezia 241/a I-43126 Parma / IT | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09786740.2 | 29.07.2009 | WO2009IB53297 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011012925 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459453 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/18, B26D7/26 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
B65C9/1819 (EP,US);
B26D1/385 (EP,US);
B26D7/2628 (EP,US);
B65C2009/1861 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEINHEIT FÜR ETIKETTIERMASCHINEN MIT DREHTROMMEL MIT MEHREREN KLINGEN | [2012/23] | English: | CUTTING UNIT FOR LABELLING MACHINES WITH A MULTIPLE-BLADE ROTARY DRUM | [2012/23] | French: | UNITÉ DE COUPE POUR MACHINES D'ÉTIQUETAGE AVEC UN TAMBOUR ROTATIF À LAMES MULTIPLES | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 03.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3822625 (OBENSHAIN D) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0025332 (B & J MFG CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 2; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0243732 (HENCH AUTOMATIK APP MASCH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 36 - page 10, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0872424 (SASIB LABELLING SPA [IT]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [I]US2002029677 (KNEPPE GUNTER [DE], et al) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0032] , [0041] - [0043]; figures 1-8 * |