29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
20.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
12.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.08.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.03.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.03.2015 |
First examination report |
|
05.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
04.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.03.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
18.03.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
08.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|