EP2307909 - A SYSTEM FOR READING INFORMATION TRANSMITTED FROM A TRANSPONDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUEHLMANN, Ulrich c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [2013/03] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
MUEHLMANN, Ulrich c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Krott, Michel, et al NXP B.V. IP & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/15] | Krott, Michel, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09786759.2 | 30.07.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009IB53322 | Priority number, date | EP20080104924 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08104924 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010013215 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2307909 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2307909 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/75, G01S5/00 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
G01S5/0036 (EP,US);
G01S13/756 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM LESEN VON TRANSPONDERÜBERMITTELTEN INFORMATIONEN | [2011/15] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR READING INFORMATION TRANSMITTED FROM A TRANSPONDER | [2011/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LECTURE DE DONNÉES TRANSMISES PAR UN TRANSPONDEUR | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2009 | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | HR | 16.01.2013 | IT | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | MK | 16.01.2013 | MT | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | SM | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | NO | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | IE | 30.07.2013 | LU | 30.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
MK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
NO | 16.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006012475 (FROITZHEIM HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,9-10,13-17 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * [I] 5-8; | [X]US2007046430 (YAMAZAKI DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 10,13-14 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] *; | [X]US6686881 (LU DAVID JUN [US], et al) [X] 10,13-14 * figure 5 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 20 * * column 6, line 42 - line 50 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 26 * | by applicant | US6943725 |