EP2329407 - NAVIGATING IN GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE ON HANDHELD DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRABHU, Sudhir, M. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09787158.6 | 10.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009IB53955 | Priority number, date | EP20080164254 | 12.09.2008 Original published format: EP 08164254 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029506 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2329407 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/44 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | NAVIGATION DURCH EINE GRAFISCHE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE AUF TRAGBAREN GERÄTEN | [2011/23] | English: | NAVIGATING IN GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE ON HANDHELD DEVICES | [2011/23] | French: | NAVIGATION DANS UNE INTERFACE GRAPHIQUE D UTILISATEUR SUR DES APPAREILS PORTATIFS | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 19.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/08] | 08.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0208881 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [A] 3 * page 14, line 11 - line 18; figure 6 *; | [A]US2002075335 (REKIMOTO JUNICHI [JP]) [A] 5* abstract *; | [A]WO2006020305 (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [X]US2006195438 (GALUTEN ALBHY [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0110] *; | [A]DE102006055252 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0039]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2008165152 (FORSTALL SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0155] * |