EP2335098 - BEAM DIRECTION CONTROLLING DEVICE AND LIGHT-OUTPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISSENBERG, Michel, C., J., M. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PIJLMAN, Fetze c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KRIJN, Marcellinus, P., C., M. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
DE ZWART, Siebe, T. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
IJZERMAN, Willem, L. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09787351.7 | 02.10.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009IB54322 | Priority number, date | EP20080166168 | 09.10.2008 Original published format: EP 08166168 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010041182 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335098 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B19/00, G02B5/04, G02B26/10, G02B3/00, F21S8/00, F21V5/02, F21V5/04, F21V14/06, G02B26/08, G02B27/09 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
G02B3/0062 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/0883 (EP,KR,US);
F21V14/04 (EP,KR,US);
F21V14/06 (EP,KR,US);
F21V5/002 (KR);
F21V5/004 (KR);
F21V5/005 (EP,US);
F21V5/007 (EP,KR,US);
F21V5/008 (EP,KR,US);
F21V5/045 (KR);
G02B19/0009 (EP,KR,US);
G02B19/0014 (EP,US);
G02B19/0033 (EP,KR,US);
G02B3/005 (EP,US);
G02B3/0056 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | G02B5/04, G02B26/10, G02B3/00, F21S8/00, F21V5/02, F21V5/04, F21V14/06, G02B26/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | STRAHLRICHTUNGS-STEUEREINRICHTUNG UND LICHTAUSGABEEINRICHTUNG | [2011/25] | English: | BEAM DIRECTION CONTROLLING DEVICE AND LIGHT-OUTPUT DEVICE | [2011/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DE DIRECTION DE FAISCEAU ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION DE LUMIÈRE | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/38] | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004099849 (ELOP ELECTROOPTICS IND LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 2 * * figures 5a,5b * | Examination | EP0179687 |