EP2324330 - METHOD FOR DETECTING CHANGES IN A VACUUM STATE IN A DETECTOR OF A THERMAL CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opgal Optronic Industries Ltd. P.O. Box 462 20101 Karmiel / IL | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMAN, Rammy 14 Katif st. Yefeh Nof 21590 Ma'a lot / IL | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 09787513.2 | 06.08.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009IL00768 | Priority number, date | US20080092440P | 28.08.2008 Original published format: US 92440 P | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010023654 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2324330 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01L21/00, G01J5/02, G01J5/06 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
G01J5/02 (EP,US);
G01J5/026 (EP,US);
G01J5/06 (EP,US);
G01M3/002 (EP,US);
G01J5/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN VON ÄNDERUNGEN EINES VAKUUMZUSTANDS IN EINEM DETEKTOR EINER THERMISCHEN KAMERA | [2011/21] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING CHANGES IN A VACUUM STATE IN A DETECTOR OF A THERMAL CAMERA | [2011/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CHANGEMENTS D'UN ÉTAT SOUS VIDE DANS UN DÉTECTEUR D'UNE CAMÉRA THERMIQUE | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005176179 (IKUSHIMA KIMIYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0337] - paragraph [0374] * * figures 34-38 *; | [Y]US2007069133 (DEWAMES ROGER E [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1, 3 *; | [Y] - WANG S N ET AL, "Thermal micropressure sensor for pressure monitoring in a minute package", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, AVS /AIP, MELVILLE, NY., US, (20010101), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 353 - 357, XP012005456 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.1333085 |