EP2311096 - OPTICAL CONNECTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO, Wararu c/o Yazaki Corporation 1500, Mishuku Susono-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09788019.9 | 30.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009JP63899 | Priority number, date | JP20080196284 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008196284 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010013841 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311096 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0203, H01L23/00, H05K9/00, H01R13/658, G02B6/42 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
H01L31/0203 (EP,US);
G02B6/4292 (EP,US);
H01L31/0232 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49002 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER STECKVERBINDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/16] | English: | OPTICAL CONNECTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2011/16] | French: | CONNECTEUR OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS5791568 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,4,5,9-11 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,7; | [XY]EP0053482 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,9-11 * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 2; figure 7 * [Y] 2,3,7; | [Y]EP1273945 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3,7 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]US7268368 (KNAPP DAVID J [US]) [A] 1-7,9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007230965 (HORIO TOMOHARU [JP]) [A] 1-7,9-11 * the whole document * |