EP2348818 - DEVICE FOR MILKING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lely Patent N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Lely Patent N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Lely Patent N.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLADS, Kristensen Asbo Byvej 10 NL-6622 Baekke Postal address: Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | 02 /
ANTOON, Peter André Theelen Bonte Specht 8 NL-4872 SP Etten leur Postal address: Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | 03 /
VAN LIER, Wilhelmus Johannes Adrianus Amberberg 3 NL-4707 NP Roosendall Postal address Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | [2017/46] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
VILLADS, Kristensen Asbo Byvej 10 NL-6622 Baekke Postal address: Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | ||
02 /
ANTOON, Peter André Theelen Bonte Specht 8 NL-4872 SP Etten leur Postal address: Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | |||
03 /
VAN LIER, Wilhelmus Johannes Adrianus Amberberg 3 NL-4707 NP Roosendall Postal address Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | Representative(s) | Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [2017/46] |
Former [2011/31] | Jennen, Peter Leonardus Hendricus Octrooibureau van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | Application number, filing date | 09788157.7 | 04.09.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009NL00173 | Priority number, date | NL20081035972 | 24.09.2008 Original published format: NL 1035972 | [2011/31] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010036102 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348818 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2348818 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/007, A01J5/017, A01K1/12, A01J7/02 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A01J7/022 (EP,US);
A01J5/007 (EP,US);
A01J5/0175 (EP,US);
A01K1/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | A01J7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MELKEN VON TIEREN | [2011/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR MILKING ANIMALS | [2011/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA TRAITE D'ANIMAUX | [2017/18] |
Former [2011/31] | DISPOSITIF POUR ANIMAUX LAITIERS | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 22.06.2011 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 30.06.2011 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 02.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2009 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.09.2009 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO03024202 (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [DX] 1-7,9,11-16,18-22 * page 6 - page 10; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8,10; | [YA]EP1905297 (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [Y] 8 * column 2 - column 7; figure 1 * [A] 11,15,16; | [Y]US4572105 (CHOWDHURY MOFAZZAL H [US], et al) [Y] 10 * column 2; figure 1 * |