EP2310305 - BUFFER CONVEYOR FOR CONVEYING AND BUFFERING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Specialty Conveyor B.V. De Corantijn 81 1689 AN Zwaag / NL | [2012/51] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Takens, Jan-Willem Gebroeders Plukkerstraat 17 1742 RE Schagen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takens, Jan-Willem Gebroeders Plukkerstraat 17 1742 RE Schagen / NL | [2012/51] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2012/21] |
Former [2011/16] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09788257.5 | 30.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009NL50470 | Priority number, date | NL20081035783 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: NL 1035783 | [2011/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010016757 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310305 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2310305 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2310305 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/51 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
B65G47/5131 (EP,US);
B65G15/00 (CN);
B65G47/52 (CN);
B65G2207/24 (CN);
B65G47/5113 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | FÖRDERER ZUR FÖRDERUNG UND PUFFERUNG VON PRODUKTEN | [2011/16] | English: | BUFFER CONVEYOR FOR CONVEYING AND BUFFERING PRODUCTS | [2011/16] | French: | CONVOYEUR TAMPON POUR TRANSPORTER ET STOCKER TEMPORAIREMENT DES PRODUITS | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2009 | Translation filed | 01.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 07.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2009 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | HR | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | MK | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | SM | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | NO | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 30.07.2013 | LU | 30.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.07.2009 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 30.07.2013 | ||
LU | 30.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 30.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 30.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 30.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
NO | 14.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]US5413213 (GOLZ PETER [DE], et al) [DX] 1-3,6-17 * figure 5 * [A] 4,5,18; | [DXA]US6152291 (STEEBER DORIAN F [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,6-17 [A] 4,5,18; | [A]WO2007096028 (KRONES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 |