EP2335289 - METHOD OF MONOLITHIC PHOTO-VOLTAIC MODULE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cencorp OYJ Insinöörinkatu 8 50100 Mikkeli / FI | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Solland Solar Energy Holding B.V. Bohr 10-Avantis 6422 RL Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON MOLTKE, Bodo Am Studio 16 12489 Berlin Berlin / DE | 02 /
BOTHE, Frank Am Studio 16 12489 Berlin / DE | 03 /
PODLOWSKI, Lars Am Studio 16 12489 Berlin / DE | 04 /
PLOMP, Bert Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | 05 /
KLOOS, Mario Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | 06 /
TJENGDRAWIRA, Caroline Vaartstraat 61 Rue du Canal 1000 Brussels / BE | 07 /
BENNETT, Ian Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | 08 /
DE JONG, Paul Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
VON MOLTKE, Bodo Am Studio 16 12489 Berlin Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
BOTHE, Frank Am Studio 16 12489 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
PODLOWSKI, Lars Am Studio 16 12489 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
PLOMP, Bert Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | |||
05 /
KLOOS, Mario Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | |||
06 /
TJENGDRAWIRA, Caroline Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | |||
07 /
BENNETT, Ian Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | |||
08 /
DE JONG, Paul Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | Representative(s) | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 09788306.0 | 04.09.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009NL50534 | Priority number, date | NL20082001958 | 05.09.2008 Original published format: NL 2001958 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010027265 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2335289 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/05, H01L31/18, H01L31/048, B23K1/005, B23K26/10, B23K26/08 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
B23K1/0056 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H01L31/0516 (EP,US);
H01L31/18 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN EINER MONOLITHISCHEN PHOTOVOLTAIKMODUL-BAUGRUPPE | [2011/25] | English: | METHOD OF MONOLITHIC PHOTO-VOLTAIC MODULE ASSEMBLY | [2011/25] | French: | PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MODULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE MONOLITHIQUE | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 04.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/not-exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Stichting Energieonderzoek Centrum Nederland Postbus 25 1755 ZG Petten / NL | Date: | 12.12.2011 | [2012/08] | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5972732 (GEE JAMES M [US], et al) [YD] 1,9,11-13 * column 4, line 40 - column 7, line 27; figures 1,3,4; claims 1,2,7-9 *; | [Y]WO2008080160 (ADVENT SOLAR INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,11-13 * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 25; claims 1-3,14-16,18 * * page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 4 * * page 12, line 29 - page 14, line 4 * * page 15, lines 2-24 *; | [A]US2005172996 (HACKE PETER [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11 * paragraphs [0045] , [0047] - [0074]; figures 4A,4B; claim 1 *; | [YA]JP2005081392 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0026] - [0060]; figures 1-4 * [A] 4-7; | [A]JP2007048835 (SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORP) [A] 1,3-7,13 * paragraphs [0014] - [0031]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6394158 (MOMENI KAVEH [DE]) [A] 1,3,13 * the whole document * | [YA] - BULTMAN J.H. ET AL., "Fast and easy single step module assembly for back-contacted c-Si solar cells with conductive adhesives", 3RD WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, OSAKA, JP, (20030511), pages 979 - 982, XP002521573 [Y] 9 * the whole document * [A] 1,11 | [A] - BULTMAN J H ET AL, "Interconnection through vias for improved efficiency and easy module manufacturing of crystalline silicon solar cells", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010101), vol. 65, no. 1-4, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0927-0248(00)00111-2, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 339 - 345, XP004217136 [A] 1,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(00)00111-2 | by applicant | WO2008080160 |