EP2321312 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PALIPERIDONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto Smarjeska cesta 6 8501 Novo mesto / SI | [2012/21] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Krka, D.D., Novo Mesto Marjeska cesta 6 8501 Novo mesto / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUZIC, Milos Milke Kerinove 9 3000 Celje / SI | 02 /
PRUDIC, Darja Smolenja vas 68c 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 03 /
PECAVAR, Anica Gotna vas 18 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 04 /
SMRKOLJ, Matej Orehovica 4 1411 Izlake Zagorje ob Savi / SI | [2015/52] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
RUZIC, Milo Milke Kerinove 9 3000 Celje / SI | ||
02 /
PRUDIC, Darja Smolenja vas 68c 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
03 /
PECAVAR, Anica Gotna vas 18 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
04 /
SMRKOLJ, Matej Orehovica 4 1411 Izlake Zagorje ob Savi / SI | Representative(s) | Redensek, Vladimira Patentna pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Redensek, Vladimira Patentna Pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 P.O. Box 1725 1001 Ljubljana / SI | ||
Former [2011/20] | Redensek, Vladimira Patentna Pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 P.O. Box 1725 1001 Ljubljana / SI | Application number, filing date | 09788631.1 | 30.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009SI00032 | Priority number, date | SI20080000190 | 31.07.2008 Original published format: SI 200800190 | [2011/20] | Filing language | SL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010014047 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321312 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2321312 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2011/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 22.02.2011 | BA | 22.02.2011 | RS | 22.02.2011 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PALIPERIDON | [2011/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PALIPERIDONE | [2011/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LA PALIPÉRIDONE | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 22.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2012 | Decision despatched | 22.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2009 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | GB | 30.07.2016 | IE | 30.07.2016 | LU | 30.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 30.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 30.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 30.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.07.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 30.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 30.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
GB | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [DYA]EP0368388 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [DY] 1-7 * example 3 * * page 6, lines 37-40 and example 3 * [A] 8,9; | [Y]US5158952 (JANSSEN CORNELUS G M [BE], et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 7, lines 65-66 and example 3 *; | [Y]EP1281420 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 6,7* claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2008015005 (KRKA [SI], et al) [Y] 1-5 * example 3 in page 16-17 *; | [DY]WO2008021345 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [DY] 1-5 * examples *; | [PY]WO2009056990 (ACTAVIS GROUP PTC EHF [IS], et al) [PY] 8,9 * the whole document *; | [A] - ROGERS ROBIN D ET AL, "Chemistry. Ionic liquids--solvents of the future?", SCIENCE (NEW YORK, N.Y.) 31 OCT 2003, (20031031), vol. 302, no. 5646, ISSN 1095-9203, pages 792 - 793, XP002553258 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1090313 |