EP2417728 - DISTRIBUTIVE CORRELATION OF CHARGING RECORDS ACROSS NETWORK DOMAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Investment Co., Ltd. 2, 11/F Xin Ye Building 388 Tianlin Road Caohejing Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 200233 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Lucent Technologies Investment Co., Ltd. 2, 11/F Xin Ye Building 388 Tianlin Road Caohejing Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 200233 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEI, Ke Room 301 Unit 1, Building 12 Long Yue Yuan No. 2 Hui Long Guan, Chang Ping District Beijing 102208 / CN | 02 /
SHARMA, Ranjan 4397 Haybury Drive New Albany OH 43054 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Hervouet-Malbec, Sylvie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc FR-92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 09789582.5 | 10.04.2009 | WO2009US40197 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010117368 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417728 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04L12/56 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
H04L12/14 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/31 (EP,US);
H04M15/41 (EP,US);
H04M15/43 (EP,US);
H04M15/53 (EP,US);
H04M15/55 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04M2215/0164 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0172 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | DISTRIBUTIVE KORRELATION VON VERGEBÜHRUNGSDATENSÄTZEN ÜBER NETZDOMÄNEN HINWEG | [2012/07] | English: | DISTRIBUTIVE CORRELATION OF CHARGING RECORDS ACROSS NETWORK DOMAINS | [2012/07] | French: | CORRÉLATION DISTRIBUTIVE D'ENREGISTREMENTS DE CHARGEMENT DANS DES DOMAINES DE RÉSEAU | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03069474 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 6,8,14,16 * page 6, lines 12-21; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1804454 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12,13,15,17-19 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0022] - [0034] *; | [XY]US2008181378 (CAI YIGANG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,12,13,15,17-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0059] - [0067]; figures 5,7 * [Y] 3,6,8,11,14,16; | [X] - 3GPP DRAFT; S2-011642, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20010620), vol. SA WG2, no. Dallas; 20010620, XP050230450 [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12,17,18 * pages 2-6 * | [YA] - KUHRIE R ET AL, "Charging in the IP Multimedia Subsystem: A Tutorial", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20070701), vol. 45, no. 7, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 92 - 99, XP011187092 [Y] 3,11 * page 93, column RIGHT, line 15 - page 95, column LEFT, line 16; figures 1,2 * * page 97, column RIGHT, line 39 - page 98, column RIGHT, line 2; figure 4 * [A] 1-20 | [A] - SIEMENS, "Correlation of Charging Information of PS Domain and the IMS", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-013363, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20011203), vol. SA WG5, no. Mexico; 20011203, XP050293280 [A] 3,11 * pages 2-5 * | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Telecommunication management; Charging management; Charging architecture and principles (3GPP TS 32.240 version 7.2.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 132 240", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070301), vol. 3-SA5, no. V7.2.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014038277 [A] 1-20 * pages 14-21 * * pages 25-26 * * pages 27-33 * * page 35, line 30 - page 36, line 8 * |