EP2307226 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXTENDING LIFE OF A VEHICLE ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALASOO, Lembit 2280 Berkley Avenue Schenectady NY 12309 / US | 02 /
KING, Robert, Dean 196 Wemple Road Schenectady NY 12306 / US | 03 /
IACOVANGELO, Charles 39 Loughberry Lake Road Saratoga Springs NY 12866 / US | 04 /
DAUM, Wolfgang 5228 Annendale Drive Erie PA 16506 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2015/15] |
Former [2011/15] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09789919.9 | 24.06.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US48366 | Priority number, date | US20080179199 | 24.07.2008 Original published format: US 179199 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010011458 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2307226 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2307226 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (US);
B60L3/0092 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60L58/14 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60L58/18 (EP);
B60L58/21 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60L7/06 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERLÄNGERUNG DER LEBENSDAUER DES ENERGIESPEICHERS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2014/35] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXTENDING LIFE OF A VEHICLE ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE | [2011/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR PROLONGER LA DURÉE DE VIE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE DE VÉHICULE | [2011/15] |
Former [2011/15] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM VERLÄNGERN DER LEBENSDAUER EINER FAHRZEUGENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2009 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | IT | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | NL | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | IE | 24.06.2015 | LU | 24.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | FR | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | GB | 08.07.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 08.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005274553 (SALMAN MUTASIM A [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0008] , [0015] , [0019] , [0020] , [0024] , [0028] , [0032] , [0039]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US6470983 (AMANO MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-26 * column 7, lines 1-9; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]JP2001314004 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-26 * abstract *; | [Y]US2002174798 (KUMAR AJITH KUTTANNAIR [US]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0057] , [0073] , [0082]; figures 2-12 *; | [Y]WO2008016129 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 11-17 * figures 1-19 *; | [Y]EP0814556 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [Y] 18,19 * column 1, lines 17-44; figures 1-4 * |