EP2329619 - PREAMBLE EXTENSIONS FOR COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN NEE, Didier, Johannes Richard 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
VAN ZELST, Albert 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
AWATER, Geert Arnout 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09791473.3 | 13.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009US53680 | Priority number, date | US20080090434P | 20.08.2008 Original published format: US 90434 P | US20090428129 | 22.04.2009 Original published format: US 428129 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010021900 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329619 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, C08F214/18, H04B7/06, H04B7/0413, H04B7/0452 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C08F214/18 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR,US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04B7/0615 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0671 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/068 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0684 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/22 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | PRÄAMBEL-ERWEITERUNGEN FÜR DIE KOMMUNIKATION | [2011/23] | English: | PREAMBLE EXTENSIONS FOR COMMUNICATIONS | [2011/23] | French: | EXTENSIONS DE SYNCHRONISEUR INITIAL | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 22.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/17] | Divisional application(s) | EP13020068.6 / EP2661008 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005271157 (VAN ZELST ALBERT [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,14-19,27-32,40-42 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0013] , [0029]; figures 5a,5b,5c *; | [XI]US2005286474 (VAN ZELST ALBERT [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,14-20,27-33,40-42 * paragraphs [0047] , [0050] , [0063] , [0097] , [0105] , [0110] , [0121]; figure 9b * [I] 10-12,23-25,36-38; | [X]US2006193340 (JONES VINCENT K [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,13-17,21,22,26-30,34,35,39-42 * paragraphs [0030] , [0032] , [0052]; figure 14 *; | [X]US2006274852 (TRACHEWSKY JASON A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,14-18,27-31,40-42* paragraphs [0039] , [0047] , [0051] * |