Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9175187 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2015 | B2 | US2011151265 | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 | US200913058679 | 13.08.2009 | WO2009US53789 | 13.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2732835 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | C | CA2732835 | 18.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 | WO2009US53789 | 13.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009281835B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | B2 | AU2009281835 | 18.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 | WO2009US53789 | 13.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2326691 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2020 | B2 | EP2326691 | 05.11.2014 | B1 | EP2326691 | 01.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 | WO2009US53789 | 13.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0917455 | 21.11.2018 | B1 | BRPI0917455 | 01.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 | WO2009US53789 | 13.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102186936B | 24.12.2014 | B | CN102186936 | 14.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 | WO2009US53789 | 13.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011001736 | 10.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 | WO2009US53789 | 13.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010019825 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A3 | WO2010019825 | 18.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US8944608 | 15.08.2008 |