EP2329600 - LOW POWER RADIO FREQUENCY DIVIDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLERSICK, William, Frederick 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09791804.9 | 21.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009US54679 | Priority number, date | US20080195733 | 21.08.2008 Original published format: US 195733 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010022366 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2329600 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/193, H03K23/66 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
H03L7/193 (EP,KR,US);
H03K23/42 (EP,US);
H03K23/505 (EP,US);
H03K23/66 (KR);
H03K23/667 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZTEILER MIT GERINGER STROMAUFNAHME | [2011/23] | English: | LOW POWER RADIO FREQUENCY DIVIDER | [2011/23] | French: | DIVISEUR RADIOFRÉQUENCE À FAIBLE CONSOMMATION | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 13.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005058236 (KE LING-WEI [TW]) [X] 1-3,9-11,17-19,22-24,27-29,32-33 * page 2, paragraph 39 - page 3, paragraph 48; figures 1-2 * [I] 4-8,12-16,20-21,25-26,30-31,34; | [A]US2008068053 (SHIMADA MIKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-34* page 3, paragraph 79 - page 5, paragraph 120; figures 1-6 *; | [XI] - SLEIMAN BOU SLEIMAN ET AL, "Wide-division-range high-speed fully programmable frequency divider", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS AND TAISA CONFERENCE, 2008. NEWCAS-TAISA 2008. 2008 JOINT 6TH INTERNATIONAL IEEE NORTHEAST WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080622), ISBN 978-1-4244-2331-6, pages 17 - 20, XP031311995 [X] 1-3,9-11,17-19,22-24,27-29,32-33 *Sections I-III*; page 17 - page 19 * [I] 4-8,12-16,20-21,25-26,30-31,34 |