EP2326688 - SELF-DISPERSED PIGMENTS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensient Colors LLC 2515 North Jefferson Avenue St. Louis, MO 63106 / US | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Sensient Colors Inc. 2526 Baldwin Street St. Louis, MO 63106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUJEETH, Puthalath, K. 1232 Arbor Bluff Circle Ballwin MO 63021 / US | 02 /
KANE, John, P. 703 Castle Tower Drive Ellisville MO 63021 / US | 03 /
OUELLETTE, Daniel, A. 24 Heather Drive St. Peters MO 63376 / US | 04 /
ULRICH, Mark 1900 Gardenia Drive Florissant MO 63031 / US | 05 /
SHING, Vincent 904 Fox Chase Arnold MO 63010 / US | 06 /
MADARAS, Mihaela 110 Lucerne Crossing Ct. Ballwin MO 63011 / US | 07 /
LANDI, Carol, D. 633 Timber Lane Devon PA 19333 / US | 08 /
GUERRERO, Alberto 5 Highland Avenue Succasunna NJ 07876 / US | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/22] | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09791815.5 | 21.08.2009 | [2011/22] | WO2009US54700 | Priority number, date | US20080091300P | 22.08.2008 Original published format: US 91300 P | US20080197087 | 22.08.2008 Original published format: US 197087 | US20080094307P | 04.09.2008 Original published format: US 94307 P | US20090154686P | 23.02.2009 Original published format: US 154686 P | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010022377 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2326688 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/00, C09B67/08, C09B67/22, C09B67/40, C09C1/56, C09D7/12, C09D11/02 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
C09C1/56 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/00 (KR);
A61K8/044 (EP);
A61K8/4966 (EP);
A61Q1/10 (EP);
C09B67/0004 (KR);
C09B67/0009 (EP);
C09B67/0013 (EP);
C09B67/0033 (KR);
C09B67/0066 (EP);
C09B68/41 (EP);
C09B68/4257 (EP);
C09B68/427 (EP);
C09B68/446 (EP);
C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D11/324 (EP);
C09D15/00 (EP);
C09D17/004 (EP);
C09D7/41 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
A61K2800/43 (EP);
A61K2800/614 (EP);
A61K2800/94 (EP);
C01P2002/85 (EP);
C01P2006/60 (EP);
C01P2006/62 (EP);
C01P2006/63 (EP);
C01P2006/64 (EP);
C01P2006/65 (EP);
C01P2006/66 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | SELBSTDISPERGIERTE PIGMENTE UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2011/22] | English: | SELF-DISPERSED PIGMENTS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2011/22] | French: | PIGMENTS AUTO-DISPERSES ET PROCEDES POUR LES FABRIQUER ET LES UTILISER | [2011/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 03.01.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 31.01.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007136540 (CABOT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-12,40-43 * examples 3, 5-9, 11 * * claims 1-38 *; | [XP]WO2009026552 (SENSIENT COLORS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-12,40-43 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] - [0044] , [0045] , [0048] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0062] - [0066] * * examples 12-48 * * claims 1-32, 36-45 *; | [XP]WO2009075802 (CABOT CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,5-12,40-42 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0016] - [0018] - [0034] , [0036] , [0058] , [0063] , [0066] , [0069] , [0072] , [0077] ** claims 1-7, 9-15, 17-20, 23-25 * |