EP2331075 - CONTROLLED-RELEASED PEPTIDE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 153 Second Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURTON, Kevin 616 Founders Park Drive W Hoover, AL 35226 / US | 02 /
WOEHR, Torsten 15 Guernsey Street Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | 03 /
TICE, Thomas, R. 5317 Mountain Park Circle Indian Springs, AL 35124 / US | 04 /
AYOUB, Mimoun Bruhlfeldweg 14 Otelfingen ZH CH-8112 / CH | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09792085.4 | 28.08.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009US55461 | Priority number, date | US20080093258P | 29.08.2008 Original published format: US 93258 P | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010025435 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2331075 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331075 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K9/16 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K9/146 (US);
A61K38/23 (KR,US);
A61K47/30 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
C07K14/585 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | A61K9/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2011/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEPTIDFORMULIERUNGEN MIT GESTEUERTER FREISETZUNG | [2011/24] | English: | CONTROLLED-RELEASED PEPTIDE FORMULATIONS | [2011/24] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE PEPTIDE À LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.02.2015 | 12.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP15174042.0 / EP2946770 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Request for further processing for: | 24.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2009 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | LU | 28.08.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 28.08.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.08.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5538739 (BODMER DAVID [CH], et al) [X] 1,7,12,14,16,17,21,22,24-40 * examples 1-11 *; | [X]WO2007084460 (QUEST PHARMACEUTICAL SERVICES [US]) [X] 1,7,12,14,16,17,21,22,24-40* examples 1-7 * |