24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
20.06.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
12.07.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
08.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.02.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
01.02.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.12.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
13.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
01.07.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
10.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|