Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE46154E | Global Dossier | 20.09.2016 | E | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 | US201414285829 | 23.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5547741B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2014 | B2 | JP2012507070 | 22.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009US57992 | 23.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2351040 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2013 | B1 | EP2351040 | 03.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009US57992 | 23.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102203873B | 09.07.2014 | B | CN102203873 | 28.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009US57992 | 23.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010047911 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8397024 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2013 | B2 | US2010106893 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101579555B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2015 | B1 | KR20110094289 | 23.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201027557 | 16.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US10850708 | 25.10.2008 | US41492509 | 31.03.2009 |