|
09.09.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
07.01.2011 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.01.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
97 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
23.03.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
49 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
42 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |