EP2347592 - VIDEO CODING WITH LARGE MACROBLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2021/43] |
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states Velos Media International Limited Unit 32, the Hyde Building The Park, Carrickmines Dublin 18 / IE | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Peisong 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
YE, Yan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Grosch, Marcus, et al Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/29] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/30] | Wimmer, Hubert, et al WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09793131.5 | 29.09.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009US58839 | Priority number, date | US20080102787P | 03.10.2008 Original published format: US 102787 P | US20090144357P | 13.01.2009 Original published format: US 144357 P | US20090166631P | 03.04.2009 Original published format: US 166631 P | US20090562438 | 18.09.2009 Original published format: US 562438 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010039731 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2347592 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2347592 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/96, H04N19/176, H04N19/70, H04N19/147, H04N19/46, H04N19/61, H04N19/103 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/50 (EP);
H04N19/103 (KR,US);
H04N19/12 (KR);
H04N19/147 (KR,US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/46 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2011/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOCODIERUNG MIT GROSSEN MAKROBLÖCKEN | [2011/30] | English: | VIDEO CODING WITH LARGE MACROBLOCKS | [2011/30] | French: | CODAGE VIDÉO AVEC DE GRANDS MACROBLOCS | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 24.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20155865.7 / EP3745724 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2020
08.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE Unified Patents, LLC 4445 Willard Avenue Suite 600 Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US Opponent's representative HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2020
08.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE Unified Patents, LLC 1875 Connecticut Ave. NW, Floor 10 Washington D.C., DC 20009 / US Opponent's representative HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2021/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2020
Unified Patents, LLC 1875 Connecticut Ave. NW, Floor 10 Washington D.C., DC 20009 / US Opponent's representative Wall, Leythem HGF B.V. Benoordenhoutseweg 46 2596 BC Den Haag / NL | 26.01.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 28.02.2023 | Appeal received No. T0513/23 | 28.02.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 02.05.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.02.2023 | Appeal received No. T0513/23 | 27.02.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 02.05.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 23.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2009 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | ES | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 29.09.2020 | LU | 29.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.09.2009 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1429564 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-56 * abstract * * paragraphs [0099] - [0121] * * figures 4,8,9,15,18 *; | [Y]US2006153297 (BOYCE JILL M [US]) [Y] 1-56 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0015] , [0043] * * figure 4 *; | [X] - PURI A ET AL, "Video coding using the H.264/MPEG-4 AVC compression standard", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.IMAGE.2004.06.003, (20041001), vol. 19, no. 9, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 793 - 849, XP004607150 [X] 1-56 * sections 2.1, 2.4, 2.5.5-2.6.3, 3 * * figures 2,3,5,6, 12 * * tables 4-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.image.2004.06.003 | [Y] - NAITO S ET AL, "Efficient coding scheme for super high definition video based on extending H.264 high profile", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SPIE, US, (20060118), vol. 6077, no. 67727, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 1 - 8, XP002538136 [Y] 1-56 * the whole document * | [A] - MA S ET AL, "High-definition video coding with super-macroblocks (Invited Paper)", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 30-1-2007 - 1-2-2007; SAN JOSE, (20070130), XP030081117 [A] 1-56 * the whole document * | [XPY] - S-C LIM ET AL, "Intra coding using extended block size", 38. VCEG MEETING; 89. MPEG MEETING; 1-7-2009 - 8-7-2009; LONDON, GENEVA; (VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP OF ITU-T SG.16), (20090707), XP030003709 [XP] 1-7,9-16,18-25,27-33,35-38,40-44,46-50,52-55 * the whole document * [Y] 8,17,26,34,39,45,51,56 | Opposition | US5999655 | US6084908 | EP1429564 | US2005123282 | US2006153297 | - PURI A et al., "Video coding using the H.264/MPEG-4 AVC compression standard", Signal Processing: Image Communication, (20041001), vol. 19, no. 9, doi:10.1016/j.image.2004.06.003, pages 793 - 849, XP004607150 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.image.2004.06.003 | - NAITO S et al., "Efficient coding scheme for super high definition video based on extending H.264 high profile", SPIE, (20060118), vol. 6077, pages 607727-1 - 607727-8, XP002538136 | - Samet Hanan, "The quadtree and related hierarchical data structures", ACM Computing Surveys, (19840600), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 187 - 260, XP002321669 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/356924.356930 | - IAIN E. G. RICHARDSON, "H.264 AND MPEG-4 VIDEO COMPRESSION, video coding for next-generation multimedia", John Wiley & Sons Ltd., (20030000), pages 1 - 306, XP055980774 |