Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011252504 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08171968 | 17.12.2008 | WO2009EP67174 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009327134 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08171968 | 17.12.2008 | WO2009EP67174 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2379723 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08171968 | 17.12.2008 | EP09793517 | 15.12.2009 | WO2009EP67174 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0922931 | 20.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08171968 | 17.12.2008 | WO2009EP67174 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2744310 | 24.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08171968 | 17.12.2008 | WO2009EP67174 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102439156 | 02.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08171968 | 17.12.2008 | WO2009EP67174 | 15.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010069950 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2011 | A9 | WO2010069950 | 24.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08171968 | 17.12.2008 |