EP2309876 - NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING OLIGOSACCHARIDE MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 28.03.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/28] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FICHOT, Marie-Claire Chemin du Péage 27 CH-1807 Blonay / CH | 02 /
SPRENGER, Norbert Chemin de la Séchaude 18 CH-1073 Savigny / CH | 03 /
MARTIN, François-Pierre Chemin des Cèdres 19 CH-1305 Penthalaz / CH | 04 /
KOCHHAR, Sunil Ch. du Grammont 2 La Claie-aux-Moines CH-1073 Savigny / CH | 05 /
REZZI, Serge Les Charmilles 42 CH-1623 Semsales / CH | [2020/13] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
FICHOT, Marie-Claire Chemin du Péage 27 CH-1807 Blonay / CH | ||
02 /
SPRENGER, Norbert Chemin de la Séchaude 18 CH-1073 Savigny / CH | |||
03 /
MARTIN, François-Pierre Chemin des Cèdres 19 CH-1305 Penthalaz / CH | |||
04 /
KOCHHAR, Sunil Ch. du Grammont 2 La Claie-aux-Moines CH-1073 Savigny / CH | |||
05 /
REZZI, Serge Les Charmilles 42 CH-1623 Semsales / CH | |||
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
FICHOT, Marie-Claire Chemin du Péage 27 CH-1807 Blonay / CH | ||
02 /
SPRENGER, Norbert Chemin de la Séchaude 18 CH-1073 Savigny / CH | |||
03 /
MARTIN, François-Pierre 751 rue du Moulin Bâtiment B/2 F-01170 Cessy / FR | |||
04 /
KOCHHAR, Sunil Ch. du Grammont 2 La Claie-aux-Moines CH-1073 Savigny / CH | |||
05 /
REZZI, Serge Les Charmilles 42 CH-1623 Semsales / CH | |||
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
FICHOT, Marie-Claire Chemin du Péage 27 CH-1807 Blonay / CH | ||
02 /
SPRENGER, Norbert Chemin de la Séchaude 18 CH-1073 Savigny / CH | |||
03 /
MARTIN, François-Pierre 751 rue du Moulin Bâtiment B/2 F-01170 Cessy / FR | |||
04 /
KOCHHAR, Sunil Ch. du Grammont 2 La Claie-aux-Moines CH-1073 Savigny / CH | |||
05 /
REZZI, Serge La Grand Chemin 59 CH-1066 Epalinges / CH | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Gagliardi, Tatiana, et al Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2013/47] | Fraisse, Sandrine, et al Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2011/16] | Corticchiato, Olivier Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 09793909.4 | 19.06.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP57656 | Priority number, date | EP20080159900 | 08.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08159900 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010003803 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309876 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2309876 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/125, A23L33/135, A23L33/22, A23L2/52, A61K45/06, A61K31/702, A61P43/00, A61K35/744, A61K35/745, A61K35/747 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
A23L33/125 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L29/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/22 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K35/744 (EP,US);
A61K35/745 (EP,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/704, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/156, A23V2200/332 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A23L1/308, A23L2/52, A23L1/09, A61K31/702, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2011/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT OLIGOSACCHARID-MISCHUNG | [2019/47] | English: | NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING OLIGOSACCHARIDE MIXTURE | [2011/16] | French: | COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE CONTENANT UN MÉLANGE D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES | [2019/47] |
Former [2011/16] | NÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT OLIGOSACCHARIDMISCHUNG | ||
Former [2011/16] | COMPOSITION NUTRITIVE CONTENANT UN MÉLANGE D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 25.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2020
19.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser Health Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB Opponent's representative Carlin, Robert George, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | 02
24.12.2020
19.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE N.V. NUTRICIA Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/08] |
Former [2021/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2020
Reckitt Benckiser Health Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB Opponent's representative Carlin, Robert George, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | 26.01.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 17.01.2023 | Appeal received No. T0109/23 | 17.01.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 01.05.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2009 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 19.06.2020 | LU | 19.06.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.06.2009 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 19.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 19.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 19.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 19.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 19.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0033854 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 7-17 * example 1; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]WO0142263 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-17 * examples 1-7; claims 1-9 *; | [DA]US2003129278 (STAHL BERND [DE], et al); | [A]WO2004002495 (BIOTIE THERAPIES OYJ [FI], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 25, line 20 - page 26, line 11 * * page 35, lines 22-24 * * page 94, line 7 - page 95, line 16 *; | [XY]WO2006091103 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 7-17 * page 9, lines 24-30; example 3; claims 14,16 * * page 1, lines 13-15 * [Y] 1-6; | [X]EP1776877 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [X] 7-17 * examples 3,4; claims 1,3,6,8,12 *; | [YA]WO2007073192 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, lines 6-29 * * page 14, line 16 - page 15, line 3; examples 1-4; claims 1,3,11 * [A] 7-17; | [DA]WO2007090894 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [DA] 1-17 * example 4; claims 1,10,11 *; | [A]WO2007101675 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * examples 1-6; claims 1-6,13 *; | [Y] - STETTLER NICOLAS ET AL, "Weight gain in the first week of life and overweight in adulthood - A cohort study of European American subjects fed infant formula", CIRCULATION, (200504), vol. 111, no. 15, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1897 - 1903, XP002507042 [Y] 1-6 * page 1897, paragraph 1 - page 1898, paragraph 1 * * page 1900, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1901, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000161797.67671.A7 | [A] - THURL S ET AL, "Quantification of individual oligosaccharide compounds from human milk using high-pH anion-exchange chromatography", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. NEW YORK, (19960101), vol. 235, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 202 - 206, XP002439151 [A] 1-17 * tables 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1996.0113 | Examination | WO2007090894 | WO2007101675 | WO2007114683 | Opposition | JP2001240599 | WO2006087391 | WO2007073192 | WO2007090894 | WO2007101675 | WO2007073175 | - SCHIPPER et al., "Individual housing of male C57BL/6J mice after weaning impairs growth and predisposes for obesity", PLoS ONE, (20200526), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 1 - 17, XP055782706 | - URASHIMA et al., "Recent advances in studies on milk oligosaccharides of cows and other domestic farm animals", Biosci Biotechnol Biochem., (20130000), vol. 77, no. 3, doi:10.1271/bbb.120810, pages 455 - 66, XP055496602 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.120810 |