EP2298715 - SPUTTERING TARGET COMPRISING LANTHANUM OXIDE AND PROCESS FOR SPUTTERING TARGET PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/12] | LANTHANUM OXIDE-BASED SINTERED OBJECT, SPUTTERING TARGET COMPRISING THE SINTERED OBJECT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LANTHANUM OXIDE-BASED SINTERED OBJECT, AND PROCESS FOR SPUTTERING TARGET PRODUCTION USING THE PROCESS | ||
[2013/39] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOH Kazuyuki c/o Isohara Factory of JX Nippon Mining &Metals Corporation ,187-4 Usaba ,Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | 02 /
KOIDO Yoshimasa c/o Isohara Factory of JX Nippon Mining &Metals Corporation 187-4,Usaba,Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09794307.0 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009JP61352 | Priority number, date | JP20080176538 | 07.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008176538 | [2011/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010004861 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298715 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/462, C04B35/486, C04B35/49, C04B35/645, H01L21/28, H01L29/51, C04B35/50, C23C14/08, C23C14/34, H01L21/02 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
C04B35/50 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/00 (KR);
C04B35/462 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/49 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
H01L21/02181 (EP,US);
H01L21/02186 (EP,US);
H01L21/02189 (EP,US);
H01L21/02192 (EP,US);
H01L21/02194 (EP,US);
H01L21/02266 (EP,US);
H01L21/28194 (EP,US);
H01L29/517 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/442 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6581 (EP,US);
C04B2235/721 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/782 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9669 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | C04B35/50, C04B35/00, C23C14/34, H01L21/02, C23C14/08, H01L21/316 | ||
Former IPC [2011/12] | C04B35/50, C04B35/00, C23C14/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | SPUTTERING-TARGET AUF LANTHANOXIDBASIS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES SPUTTERING-TARGETS | [2013/39] | English: | SPUTTERING TARGET COMPRISING LANTHANUM OXIDE AND PROCESS FOR SPUTTERING TARGET PRODUCTION | [2013/39] | French: | CIBLE DE PULVÉRISATION À BASE D'OXYDE DE LANTHANE, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE CIBLE DE PULVÉRISATION. | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/12] | GESINTERTES OBJEKT AUF LANTHANOXIDBASIS, SPUTTERING-TARGET MIT DEM GESINTERTEN OBJEKT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GESINTERTEN OBJEKTS AUF LANTHANOXIDBASIS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES SPUTTERING-TARGETS IN DIESEM VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2011/12] | LANTHANUM OXIDE-BASED SINTERED OBJECT, SPUTTERING TARGET COMPRISING THE SINTERED OBJECT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LANTHANUM OXIDE-BASED SINTERED OBJECT, AND PROCESS FOR SPUTTERING TARGET PRODUCTION USING THE PROCESS | ||
Former [2011/12] | OBJET FRITTÉ À BASE D'OXYDE DE LANTHANE, CIBLE DE PULVÉRISATION COMPRENANT L'OBJET FRITTÉ, PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE L'OBJET FRITTÉ À BASE D'OXYDE DE LANTHANE, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE CIBLE DE PULVÉRISATION EN UTILISANT LE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2010 | Translation filed | 20.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 11.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 06.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1178129 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0062] , [0 96] *; | [I]EP1501090 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0222] - paragraph [0223] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0132] * | International search | [X]JPH04164858 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD); | [A]JP2000001362 (NIPPON SERATEKKU KK, et al); | [X]JP2001505620 (SIEMENS AG.); | [A]JP2001342056 (CHUBU KIRESUTO KK, et al); | [A]JP2004327210 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004339035 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [X]WO2006025350 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007142333 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007334357 (SCHOTT AG); | [X] - YAMING JI ET AL.,, "Fabrication of transparent La2Hf207 ceramics from combustion synthesized powders", MATERIALS RESEARCH BULLETIN, vol. 40, no. ISS.3, pages 553 - 559, XP004753215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.materresbull.2004.10.010 | by applicant | JP2007324593 | - ALSHAREEF H.N.; QUEVEDO-LOPEZ M.; WEN H.C.; HARRIS R.; KIRSCH P.; MAJHI P.; LEE B.H.; JAMMY R., "Work function engineering using lanthanum oxide interfacial layers", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2006), vol. 89, no. 23, pages 232103 - 232103,3 |