Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
03.04.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.07.2012 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
27.07.2012 | Change - classification | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
27.07.2012 | Change - classification | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
13.06.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2011 | Change - representative | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
16.09.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
22.06.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.04.2011 | Change - inventor | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
18.02.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
18.02.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
21.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.02.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.01.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.01.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |