EP2299525 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Maiko 2-13-10-306, Amakubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0005 / JP | 02 /
IMANARI, Yuichiro 2-13-10-401 Amakubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0005 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Taketsugu 2-13-1-3-101 Umezono Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0045 / JP | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
SAKAI, Maiko 2-40-1-222 Kasuga Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0821 / JP | ||
02 /
IMANARI, Yuichiro 2-13-10-401 Amakubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0005 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAMOTO, Taketsugu 2-13-1-3-101 Umezono Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0045 / JP | Representative(s) | Brunetti, Fabrizio, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/12] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09794538.0 | 07.07.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009JP62646 | Priority number, date | JP20080179606 | 09.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008179606 | [2011/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010005095 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299525 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, H01M2/16, H01M4/02, C01B25/30, C01B25/37, C01B25/45, H01M4/485, H01M4/525 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H01M4/5825 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/45 (EP,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M4/04 (KR);
H01M4/0471 (KR);
H01M4/136 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/1397 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/624 (KR);
H01M50/414 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (KR);
H01M50/451 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,US);
H01M50/426 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (KR);
Y02T10/70 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | H01M4/58, H01M2/16, H01M4/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2011/12] | English: | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2011/12] | French: | BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2011 | Translation filed | 05.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 26.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO02097907 (VALENCE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0124] - [0147] *; | [Y] - ZIEMNIAK STEPHEN E ET AL, "Hydrothermal synthesis of maricite via iron oxide decomposition in sodium phosphate solutions", POWERPLANT CHEMISTRY, POWERPLANT CHEMISTRY GMBH, DE, (20030101), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1438-5325, pages 69 - 74, XP009160916 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH10324758 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2000030686 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2000294238 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2005276474 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD); | [AP]JP2009054576 (NIPPON CHEMICAL IND); | [XP]JP2009081072 (FURUKAWA BATTERY CO LTD, et al); | [AP]JP2009146773 (AGC SEIMI CHEMICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH10324758 | JP2000030686 | JP2000294238 | JP2004533706 |