EP2299747 - PERSONALIZED SERVICE SYSTEM BASED ON SMART CAR AND METHOD THEREOF, AND SMART CARD APPLIED TO THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Planet Co., Ltd. 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-844 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states SK Planet Co., Ltd. 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-844 / KR | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Sk Telecom Co., LTD 11 Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-844 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seung Hwan 513-1002, Hyojachon Samhwan Apt. Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam Gyeonggi-do 463-762 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Jae Sung 3rd Fl. 236-27, Eungam 2-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-012 / KR | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09794576.0 | 11.05.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009KR02474 | Priority number, date | KR20080067180 | 10.07.2008 Original published format: KR 20080067180 | KR20080084641 | 28.08.2008 Original published format: KR 20080084641 | [2011/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010005170 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2299747 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18, G06F9/06, G06Q30/02 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0255 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0267 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | H04W8/18, G06F9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERTES SERVICESYSTEM AUF SMARTCARD-BASIS UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE IN DIESEM SYSTEM VERWENDETE SMART-CARD | [2011/12] | English: | PERSONALIZED SERVICE SYSTEM BASED ON SMART CAR AND METHOD THEREOF, AND SMART CARD APPLIED TO THE SAME | [2011/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SERVICE PERSONNALISÉ REPOSANT SUR L'UTILISATION D'UNE CARTE INTELLIGENTE, PROCÉDÉ ET CARTE INTELLIGENTE ASSOCIÉS | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2010 | Translation filed | 29.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 22.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/21] | 11.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2019 | 31.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2001011227 (ASHERY LAWRENCE E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] *; | [I]US6847969 (MATHAI TOM J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 20 *; | [I]US2006156256 (LEE CHANGSEOK [KR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US2008091518 (EISENSON HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0079] *; | [A]WO2008068963 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - URIEN P ED - KONSTANTOPOULOS CHARALAMPOS BELLAVISTA PAOLO HUANG CHI-FU TURGUT DAMLA, "Internet card, a smart card as a true Internet node", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20001101), vol. 23, no. 17, doi:10.1016/S0140-3664(00)00252-8, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 1655 - 1666, XP004238469 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-3664(00)00252-8 | International search | [A]KR20030081817 (KT ICOM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20040024289 (BANK CO LTD OFF); | [A]KR20060088641 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR100764658B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20080023964 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | Examination | - "Smartcard-Web-Server ; OMA-TS-Smartcard_Web_Server-V1_0-20071002-C", no. 1.0, (20071002), pages 1 - 88, OMA-TS-SMARTCARD_WEB_SERVER-V1_0-20071002-C, OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE (OMA), 4330 LA JOLLA VILLAGE DR., SUITE 110 SAN DIEGO, CA 92122 ; USA, URL: ftp/Public_documents/ARCH/ARC-SEC_SCT/Permanent_documents/, (20071003), XP064022530 |